FL S1162 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting an administering agency from disbursing funds from any category of the General Appropriations Act for infrastructure projects under certain conditions; requiring a grantee to use the revenues for infrastructure projects for certain activities; prohibiting water management districts from appropriating or disbursing funds to grantees for water-related projects unless certain conditions are met; prohibiting certain entities from applying for water project grant funding, etc.
Title
Infrastructure Project Funding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Environment and Natural Resources |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2021-12-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H621 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
216 | 3492 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 885 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1162 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1162/BillText/Filed/HTML |