FL S1134 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the "Patient Injury Act;" requiring the Department of Health or certain boards thereof to require the completion of a course relating to communication of medical errors; specifying that certain provisions are an exclusive remedy for personal injury or wrongful death; providing for a determination of compensation upon a prima facie claim of a medical injury having been made; requiring notice to patients of provider participation in the Patient Compensation System, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Compensation for Personal Injury or Wrongful Death Arising from a Medical Injury

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-03SenateDied in Judiciary
2013-03-05SenateIntroduced
2013-02-28SenateReferred to Judiciary; Health Policy; Appropriations; Rules
2013-02-22SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0897 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
H0899 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
S1082 (Related) 2013-05-03 - Died in Health Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
456013Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback