FL S1106 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Chapter No. 2013-179
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Chapter No. 2013-179
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Restricting a local government's ability to regulate agritourism activity on agricultural land; limiting the liability of an agritourism operator, his or her employer or employee, or the owner of the underlying land on which the agritourism activity occurs if certain conditions are met; requiring that signs and contracts notify participants of certain inherent risks and the assumption of that risk, etc.
Title
Agritourism
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#334 (Y: 95 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-17 | Chapter No. 2013-179 | |
2013-06-14 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-06-10 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2013-04-30 | House | CS passed; YEAS 95 NAYS 21 |
2013-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-29 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-29 | House | Substituted for CS/CS/HB 927 |
2013-04-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-26 | House | Received |
2013-04-26 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/13 |
2013-04-26 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2013-04-16 | House | In Messages |
2013-04-11 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/13 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2013-04-03 | Senate | CS/CS by Rules read 1st time |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/02/13, 8:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/20/13, 3:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2013-03-12 | Senate | CS by Agriculture read 1st time |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-03-11 | Senate | CS by Agriculture; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 03/11/13, 3:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture; Community Affairs; Rules |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0927 (Similar To) 2013-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1106 (Ch. 2013-179)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
570 | 96 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 961 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 963 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 964 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |