FL S1092 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for enactment of the agreement; providing a method by which a state may become a member state; requiring a statewide popular election for President and Vice President of the United States; establishing a procedure for appointing presidential electors in member states; providing that the agreement becomes effective upon the occurrence of specified actions; providing for the withdrawal of a member state; requiring notification of member states when the agreement takes effect in a nonmember state or when a member state withdraws from the agreement, etc.
Title
Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by National Popular Vote
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Ethics and Elections |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Judiciary; Rules |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H39 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Public Integrity & Elections Committee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1092 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1092/BillText/Filed/HTML |