FL H0039 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Public Integrity & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Public Integrity & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for enactment of Agreement Among States to Elect President by National Popular Vote; provides method by which state may become member state; requires statewide popular election for President & Vice President of U.S.; establishes procedure for appointing presidential electors in member states; provides that agreement becomes effective upon occurrence of specified actions; provides for withdrawal of member state; requires notification of member states when agreement takes effect in nonmember state or when member state withdraws from agreement.
Title
Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by National Popular Vote
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Geller [D] | Rep. Anna Eskamani [D] | Rep. Michael Grieco [D] | Rep. Dotie Joseph [D] |
Rep. Kelly Skidmore [D] | Rep. Carlos Smith [D] | Rep. Marie Woodson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-01-15 | House | Referred to Public Integrity and Elections Committee; Judiciary Committee |
2020-12-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1092 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/39 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/39/BillText/Filed/PDF |