FL S1090 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Florida Virtual School to give enrollment priority to dependent children of certain active duty military personnel; authorizing the Florida Virtual School to use a specified form to determine residency and to serve specified students directly; requiring that certain dependent children of active duty military personnel be given first preference for admission to certain virtual instruction programs, etc.
Title
Enrollment of Dependent Children of Active Duty Military Personnel in the Florida Virtual School
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education, 02/08/18, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2018-01-23 | Senate | CS by Education read 1st time |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-01-16 | Senate | CS by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 01/16/18, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education; Appropriations |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H699 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee
H949 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee
S1198 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Education
H29 (Similar To) 2018-03-14 - Chapter No. 2018-7
S1884 (Similar To) 2018-03-02 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 29
H7055 (Similar To) 2018-03-12 - Chapter No. 2018-6
H949 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee
S1198 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Education
H29 (Similar To) 2018-03-14 - Chapter No. 2018-7
S1884 (Similar To) 2018-03-02 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 29
H7055 (Similar To) 2018-03-12 - Chapter No. 2018-6
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 37 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |