FL S1082 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 77 (Ch. 2021-61)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 77 (Ch. 2021-61)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring specified public airports to require a diesel exhaust fluid safety mitigation and exclusion plan for certain fixed-base operators; requiring public airports to make such plans available for review during inspections by the Department of Transportation after a specified date; requiring the department to convene a workgroup of public airport representatives by a specified date to develop specified uniform industry standards, etc.
Title
Diesel Exhaust Fluid
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Transportation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Transportation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 77 (Ch. 2021-61) |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 77 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-22 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/21 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Original reference(s) removed: Rules |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-04-21 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/21/21, 4:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Remaining references corrected to Appropriations; Rules |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Original reference(s) removed: Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2021-03-25 | Senate | CS by Transportation read 1st time |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-03-24 | Senate | CS by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/24/21, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building |
2021-03-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/03/21, 9:30 am, 110 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H77 (Same As) 2021-06-09 - Chapter No. 2021-61