FL S1066 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing honorary designations of certain transportation facilities in specified counties, etc.
Title
Transportation Facility Designations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#32 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Messages |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-03-09 | House | In Messages |
2018-03-09 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/18 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-03-02 | Senate | CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/02/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2018-02-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/18, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered |
2018-02-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/22/18, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/14/18, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 02/06/18, 2:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H171 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 382
S382 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-161
S382 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-161