FL S1054 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting from liability for any costs of site rehabilitation people who generate, sell, or otherwise transfer recovered materials, or who sell or transfer products, raw materials, or commodities made from recovered materials, under certain circumstances; providing retroactive application under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Recovered Materials
Sponsors
Sen. Aaron Bean [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Judiciary; Appropriations |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1133 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1054 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1054/BillText/Filed/HTML |