FL S1052 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00918; Amendment(s) adopted (139592) -SJ 00918; Substituted CS/HB 569 (Vetoed by Governor) -SJ 00918; Laid on Table -SJ 00918
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00918; Amendment(s) adopted (139592) -SJ 00918; Substituted CS/HB 569 (Vetoed by Governor) -SJ 00918; Laid on Table -SJ 00918
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the disposal of yard trash at a Class I landfill if the landfill has a system for collecting landfill gas and arranges for the reuse of the gas and has obtained a minor permit modification.
Title
Solid Waste Disposal [EPSC]
Sponsors
Sen. Don Gaetz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-27 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00918; Amendment(s) adopted (139592) -SJ 00918; Substituted CS/HB 569 (Vetoed by Governor) -SJ 00918; Laid on Table -SJ 00918 | |
2010-04-22 | Original reference(s) removed: Community Affairs; Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00752 | |
2010-04-21 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-04-20 | CS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 00702; CS read 1st time on 04/21/10 -SJ 00706 | |
2010-04-15 | On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 04/20/10, 1:00 pm, 401-S | |
2010-03-12 | On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 03/17/10, 3:30 pm, 401-S --Temporarily postponed | |
2010-03-04 | On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 03/09/10, 2:00 pm, 401-S --Temporarily postponed | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Community Affairs -SJ 00075 | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Community Affairs | |
2010-01-04 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0569 (Similar To) 2010-07-19 - Veto Message received -HJ 00009; Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
H7243 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Chapter No. 2010-143; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102)
H7243 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Chapter No. 2010-143; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102)