FL H0569 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-19 - Veto Message received -HJ 00009; Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
Pending: House Rules & Calendar Council Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes disposal of yard trash at Class I landfill if landfill has system for collecting landfill gas & arranges for reuse of gas; requires DEP to develop & adopt methodology to award recycling credit for such use; requires landfill to obtain minor permit modification to its operating permit before receiving yard trash; specifies which entities of local government may accept incidental amounts of yard trash at landfill; provides applicability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Solid Waste Disposal [EPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-30 - House - House Roll Call No. 1101 - Passage (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0017 - Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0016 - Amendment (Y: 12 N: 21 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-15 - House - House Roll Call No. 0774 - Passage (Y: 110 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-07-19 Veto Message received -HJ 00009; Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
2010-06-01 Vetoed by Governor
2010-05-17 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2010-04-30 Concurred -HJ 01326; CS passed as amended; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 -HJ 01326; Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 01327
2010-04-29 In returning messages
2010-04-29 Read 3rd time -SJ 01038; Amendment(s) failed -SJ 01038; CS passed as amended; YEAS 35 NAYS 1 -SJ 01050
2010-04-27 Withdrawn from Environmental Preservation and Conservation -SJ 00919; Substituted for CS/SB 1052 -SJ 00918; Read 2nd time -SJ 00918; Amendment(s) adopted (824484) -SJ 00918
2010-04-26 Received -SJ 00873; Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation -SJ 00873
2010-04-15 In Messages
2010-04-15 Read 3rd time -HJ 00686; CS passed as amended; YEAS 110 NAYS 5 -HJ 00687; Immediately certified -HJ 00714
2010-04-13 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00666; Amendment(s) adopted -HJ 00666
2010-03-17 Favorable by- General Government Policy Council; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 -HJ 00341; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00341
2010-03-15 On Council agenda-- General Government Policy Council, 03/17/10, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall
2010-03-10 Favorable by Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); YEAS 9 NAYS 3 -HJ 00259; Now in General Government Policy Council -HJ 00259
2010-03-08 Now in Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA) -HJ 00225; On Committee agenda-- Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA), 03/10/10, 8:30 am, Webster Hall
2010-03-04 CS read 1st time on 03/04/10 -HJ 00216; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20
2010-03-03 CS by Agriculture & Natural Resources Policy (GGPC); YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 00218
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Policy (GGPC); Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); General Government Policy Council -HJ 00053; On Committee agenda-- Agriculture & Natural Resources Policy (GGPC), 03/03/10, 2:00 pm, Reed Hall
2010-03-01 On Committee agenda-- Agriculture & Natural Resources Policy (GGPC), 03/03/10, 2:00 pm, Reed Hall
2010-01-20 Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Policy (GGPC); Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); General Government Policy Council
2010-01-05 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S1052 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00918; Amendment(s) adopted (139592) -SJ 00918; Substituted CS/HB 569 (Vetoed by Governor) -SJ 00918; Laid on Table -SJ 00918
H7243 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Chapter No. 2010-143; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
0403708Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=0569&Chamber=House&Year=2010
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb056900.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb056901c1.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb056902e1.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb056903e2.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/hHB05690415100774.html
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/SHB05690429100016.html
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/SHB05690429100017.html
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/hHB05690430101101.html

Bill Comments

feedback