FL S1040 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 5 (Ch. 2019-64)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing that a referendum to adopt or amend a local discretionary sales surtax must be held at a general election; requiring a county to make the proposed referendum and a specified legal opinion available on its official website; requiring the Office of Program Policy Analysis and Government Accountability, upon receiving a certain notice, to procure a certified public accountant for a performance audit, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Discretionary Sales Surtaxes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 5 (Ch. 2019-64)
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-16SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-16SenateFavorable by Finance and Tax; YEAS 7 NAYS 1
2019-04-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 04/16/19, 1:00 pm, 401 Senate Building
2019-04-02SenateCS by Community Affairs read 1st time
2019-03-28SenateNow in Finance and Tax
2019-03-27SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-26SenateCS by Community Affairs; YEAS 4 NAYS 1
2019-03-21SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/26/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-22SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2019-02-14SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H5 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-64
S336 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 5 (Ch. 2019-64)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
212055Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback