FL H0005 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-64
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that a referendum to adopt or amend a local discretionary sales surtax must be held at a general election; requiring the Office of Program Policy Analysis and Government Accountability, upon receiving a certain notice, to procure a certified public accountant for a performance audit; requiring a supervisor of elections to verify petition signatures and retain signature forms in a specified manner; providing that an initiative sponsor's failure to comply with the specified requirements renders any referendum held void; requiring a paid petition circulator to register with the Secretary of State and provide certain information; prohibiting compensation for initiative petition circulators based on the number of petition forms gathered; providing penalties for failure to register as a petition circulator, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ballot Measures

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#34 (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#378 (Y: 67 N: 43 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#377 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#17 (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#97 (Y: 69 N: 44 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Chapter No. 2019-64
2019-06-07 Approved by Governor
2019-06-06 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-05-03HouseOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2019-05-03SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 22 NAYS 17
2019-05-03SenateConcurred in House amendment(s) to Senate amendment(s) (964263, 980309)
2019-05-03SenateIn returning messages
2019-05-03HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 67 NAYS 43
2019-05-03HouseConcurred in Senate amendment(s) as amended (338888)
2019-05-03HouseAmendment(s) to Senate amendment(s) adopted (964263, 980309) 1272
2019-05-03HouseIn returning messages
2019-05-03SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 29 NAYS 11
2019-05-03SenateAmendment(s) reconsidered, adopted as amended (338888)
2019-05-03SenateMotion to reconsider adopted
2019-05-03SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-05-02SenateAmendment(s) adopted (498526)
2019-05-02SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-02SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 336
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-05-02SenateWithdrawn from Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2019-04-22SenateReceived
2019-04-18SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2019-04-18SenateIn Messages
2019-04-11HouseCS passed; YEAS 69 NAYS 44
2019-04-11HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-10HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19
2019-04-01HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-01HouseCS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time
2019-03-29HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-28HouseCS/CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 7
2019-03-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/28/19, 10:30 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-12HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-03-12HouseFavorable by Ways and Means Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 5
2019-03-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- Ways and Means Committee, 03/12/19, 4:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-03-07HouseCS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-07HouseNow in Ways and Means Committee
2019-03-07HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-05HouseCS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 3
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-01HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 03/05/19, 1:00 pm, 12 HOB
2019-02-20HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; State Affairs Committee
2019-02-13HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S336 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 5 (Ch. 2019-64)
S1040 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 5 (Ch. 2019-64)
H7111 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 5 (Ch. 2019-64)
S7096 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 5 (Ch. 2019-64)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100371Amended CodeSee Bill Text
104186Amended CodeSee Bill Text
104187Amended CodeSee Bill Text
212055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
97021Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/5
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/5/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/5/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/5/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/5/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/5/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/5/Amendment/271649/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/5/Amendment/530804/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/5/Amendment/262082/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/5/Amendment/240508/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/5/Amendment/498526/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/5/Amendment/748556/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/5/Amendment/975858/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/5/Amendment/338888/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/5/Amendment/980309/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/5/Amendment/964263/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/5/Amendment/569418/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/5/Amendment/696284/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/5/Amendment/859944/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/5/Amendment/926492/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/5/Vote/HouseVote_h00005c2097.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/5/Vote/SenateVote_h00005c2017.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/5/Vote/HouseVote_h00005c2377.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/5/Vote/HouseVote_h00005c2378.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/5/Vote/SenateVote_h00005c2034.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback