FL S1040 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7023 (Ch. 2013-251), HB 5501 (Ch. 2013-55)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7023 (Ch. 2013-251), HB 5501 (Ch. 2013-55)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Transferring the collection of the motor fuel inspection fee from the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services to the Department of Revenue; providing additional grounds for disciplinary action against firearm licensees; revising procedures and requirements with respect to the submission and processing of registration statements and renewal statements by charitable organizations and sponsors; repealing a provision relating to mandatory filings and disclosure of advertisement identification numbers by sellers of business opportunities, etc.
Title
Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7023 (Ch. 2013-251), HB 5501 (Ch. 2013-55) |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 7023 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-23 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/13 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-04-18 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/13, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government, 03/19/13, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government |
2013-03-12 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-03-11 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/11/13, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7023 (Similar To) 2013-07-01 - Chapter No. 2013-251, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5501 (Ch. 2013-55)
H1189 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7023 (Ch. 2013-251)
H5501 (Similar To) 2013-05-20 - Chapter No. 2013-55, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7023 (Ch. 2013-251), SB 1500 (Ch. 2013-40)
S0720 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Commerce and Tourism, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7023 (Ch. 2013-251)
H1189 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7023 (Ch. 2013-251)
H5501 (Similar To) 2013-05-20 - Chapter No. 2013-55, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7023 (Ch. 2013-251), SB 1500 (Ch. 2013-40)
S0720 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Commerce and Tourism, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7023 (Ch. 2013-251)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
206 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
206 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
493 | 6101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
493 | 6113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
493 | 6116 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
493 | 6118 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
493 | 6120 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
493 | 6121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
496 | 405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
496 | 406 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
496 | 407 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
496 | 409 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
496 | 410 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
496 | 411 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
496 | 415 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
496 | 419 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 016 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 059 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 603 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 604 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 607 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 608 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 611 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 615 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 617 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
507 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
507 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
507 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
525 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
525 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
525 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
525 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
526 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
527 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
527 | 0201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
527 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
531 | 415 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
531 | 60 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
531 | 61 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
531 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
531 | 63 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
531 | 64 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
531 | 65 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
531 | 66 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
539 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 802 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 803 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 805 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 807 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 813 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 815 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 9221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
616 | 242 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
721 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |