FL S1038 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting certain awards of attorney fees to certain persons or entities in suits based on claims arising under property insurance policies; providing that an assignment agreement is not valid unless specified conditions are met, etc.
Title
Assignment of Property Insurance Benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Banking and Insurance |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1421 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1038 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1038/BillText/Filed/HTML |