FL S1034 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - In returning messages; Died in returning Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - In returning messages; Died in returning Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Revises the standards of conduct for commissioners of the PSC. Requires that commissioners observe and abide by the Code of Judicial Conduct while conducting docketed proceedings. Prohibits a commissioner or the commissioner's direct reporting staff from initiating, engaging in, or considering prohibited communications in any proceeding other than an undocketed workshop or an internal affairs meeting, etc.
Title
Public Service Commission [EPSC]
Sponsors
Sen. Victor Crist [R] | Rep. Mike Fasano [R] | Sen. Don Gaetz [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0044 - House Message (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-26 - House - House Roll Call No. 0996 - Passage (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0008 - Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-26 - House - House Roll Call No. 0996 - Passage (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0008 - Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | In returning messages; Died in returning Messages | |
2010-04-30 | In returning messages; Refused to concur, requested Senate to recede -HJ 01684 | |
2010-04-30 | Amendment(s) to House amendment(s) adopted -SJ 01232, -SJ 01239; Concurred in House amendment(s) as amended -SJ 01239; CS passed as amended (904532, 884785, 678588, 148795); YEAS 39 NAYS 0 -SJ 01239 | |
2010-04-26 | In returning messages | |
2010-04-26 | Read 3rd time -HJ 01091; Amendment(s) adopted -HJ 01091; CS passed as amended; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 -HJ 01091 | |
2010-04-23 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00959; Amendment(s) adopted -HJ 00959 | |
2010-04-21 | Received -HJ 00841; Referred to Calendar -HJ 00842 | |
2010-03-16 | In Messages | |
2010-03-03 | Read 3rd time -SJ 00182; CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 1 -SJ 00182 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Rules -SJ 00073; On Committee agenda-- Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities, 02/02/10, 8:15 am, 301-S; Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities (237068); YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 00163; Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments); Now in Rules -SJ 00163; On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/16/10, 8:45 am, 110-S; CS by- Rules; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 -SJ 00164; CS read 1st time on 03/02/10 -SJ 00158; Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute); Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00165; Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00007; Amendment(s) adopted (973538) -SJ 00008; Ordered engrossed -SJ 00009 | |
2010-02-25 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | |
2010-02-18 | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-02-16 | CS by- Rules; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 | |
2010-02-08 | Now in Rules; On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/16/10, 8:45 am, 110-S | |
2010-02-02 | Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities (237068); YEAS 8 NAYS 0; Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments) | |
2010-01-22 | On Committee agenda-- Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities, 02/02/10, 8:15 am, 301-S | |
2010-01-14 | Referred to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Rules | |
2009-12-23 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0565 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Energy & Utilities Policy (GGPC)
H7209 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar
H7209 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0350 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0350 | 042 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0350 | 0605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0350 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0364 | 183 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0366 | 093 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0367 | 156 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0368 | 108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |