FL S1022 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the duties of the Division of Florida Condominiums, Timeshares, and Mobile Homes of the Department of Business and Professional Regulation relating to mobile home parks; revising requirements relating to the delivery of a prospectus; revising disclosures that must be contained in a prospectus or offering circular; prohibiting a court or arbitrators from considering certain mobile home parks when determining market rent; requiring homeowners' associations to notify park owners upon the election or appointment of new officers or members, etc.
Title
Mobile Home Parks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Judiciary; Rules |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1449 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
H1339 (Similar To) 2020-06-10 - Chapter No. 2020-27
S998 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 1339
H1339 (Similar To) 2020-06-10 - Chapter No. 2020-27
S998 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 1339
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
723 | 004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
723 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
723 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
723 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
723 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
723 | 033 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
723 | 037 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
723 | 038 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
723 | 0381 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
723 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
723 | 068 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
723 | 076 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
723 | 078 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
723 | 079 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
723 | 1255 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1022 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1022/BillText/Filed/HTML |