FL S0994 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Chapter No. 2013-18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Chapter No. 2013-18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amending and repealing provisions to conform to the directive of the Legislature in section 9 of chapter 2012-116, Laws of Florida, to prepare a reviser's bill to omit all statutes and laws, or parts thereof, which grant duplicative, redundant, or unused rulemaking authority; amending provisions to conform to the changes made in this act, etc.
Title
Florida Statutes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#30 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-11 | Chapter No. 2013-18 | |
2013-04-10 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-04-09 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2013-03-22 | House | Passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-03-21 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-03-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-03-21 | House | Substituted for HB 7077 |
2013-03-19 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/21/13 |
2013-03-18 | House | Received |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2013-03-12 | House | In Messages |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/12/13 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-03-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/06/13, 4:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7077 (Same As) 2013-03-21 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 994 (Ch. 2013-18)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1011 | 48 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 51 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 765 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 467 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 965 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
110 | 118 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 358 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 361 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
119 | 0712 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 65 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
17 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
199 | 1851 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
201 | 165 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
202 | 37 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
207 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
207 | 0281 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 097 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 098 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
213 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 61 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 1501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
23 | 1231 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
238 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
258 | 0165 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 1045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 706 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 816 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 0747 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 525 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
317 | 0005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 0657 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 0848 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 161 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 0221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
328 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
328 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 2817 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 55 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
376 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
376 | 317 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
379 | 245 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 0666 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
391 | 304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
391 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
393 | 0641 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 0185 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 99 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 998 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 063 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 176 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 518 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 3025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 81 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 0861 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 7191 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 14511 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 2576 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 2578 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 2675 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 441 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 9101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
411 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
411 | 224 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
414 | 158 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
414 | 1585 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
414 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
415 | 1105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 5091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 291 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
430 | 708 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
430 | 902 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 1312 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 1313 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
455 | 2255 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
472 | 017 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 146 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
496 | 414 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 381 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 0583 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
509 | 036 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
548 | 024 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 897 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
556 | 116 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
563 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
564 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
564 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
578 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
582 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
601 | 74 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
601 | 75 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
601 | 76 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
601 | 77 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
601 | 78 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
601 | 80 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
607 | 193 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 487 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 096 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 212 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 793 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 917 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
633 | 445 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
634 | 289 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 316 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 922 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
658 | 995 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
663 | 319 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
668 | 704 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
713 | 78 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
713 | 785 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 7021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 713 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
766 | 304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
865 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 0543 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 0544 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 095 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
945 | 73 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
946 | 525 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
949 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
984 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 66 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |