FL S0980 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removing a requirement that a virtual instruction program provider document that it locates an administrative office or offices in this state, requires its administrative staff to be state residents, and requires all instructional staff to be Florida-certified teachers, etc.
Title
Virtual Instruction Programs
Sponsors
Sen. Manny Diaz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Education |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2021-11-18 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/980 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/980/BillText/Filed/HTML |