FL S0974 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Withdrawn from further consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Withdrawn from further consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that certain acts committed by a licensee are grounds for discipline, etc.
Title
Grounds for Discipline of Health Care Professionals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | Senate | Withdrawn from further consideration |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Withdrawn from Health Policy; Fiscal Policy |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Fiscal Policy |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0815 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/974 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0974/BillText/Filed/HTML |