FL H0815 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that advertising certification from specialty board, when licensee has not completed certain residency or fellowship, is grounds for discipline.
Title
Health Professions
Sponsors
Rep. Cary Pigman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Health Quality Subcommittee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-02-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0974 (Similar To) 2015-04-01 - Withdrawn from further consideration
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/815 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0815/BillText/Filed/PDF |