FL S0942 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the Board of Professional Engineers to establish fees relating to professional structural engineer licensing; requiring applicants to pay a specified fee to be eligible to receive a professional structural engineer license, etc.
Title
Fees/Professional Structural Engineer Licensing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Regulated Industries (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Regulated Industries (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/07/22, 2:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2022-01-27 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Now in Commerce and Tourism |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/25/22, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations |
2021-11-16 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S940 (Related) 2022-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 375
H565 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
H375 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Chapter No. 2022-81
H565 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
H375 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Chapter No. 2022-81
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
471 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
471 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |