FL H0375 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - Chapter No. 2022-81
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - Chapter No. 2022-81
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Structural Engineering Recognition Program for Professional Engineers; requires Board of Professional Engineers to recognize licensed professional engineer who has successfully passed specified examination; provides requirements for application & recognition; prohibits fee for such application or for recognition; authorizes professional engineer recognized by program to identify such recognition in her or his professional practice & marketing & advertising materials.
Title
Structural Engineering Recognition Program for Professional Engineers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#38 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#714 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#714 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | Chapter No. 2022-81 | |
2022-04-27 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-04-27 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2022-03-04 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2022-03-04 | House | In Messages |
2022-03-04 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Substituted for SB 940 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Received |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2022-03-04 | Senate | In Messages |
2022-03-04 | House | CS passed; YEAS 112, NAYS 0 |
2022-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-03 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-03-03 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-03-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-28 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022) |
2022-02-24 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-02-24 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2022-02-24 | House | Reported out of Commerce Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Favorable by Commerce Committee |
2022-02-21 | House | Added to Commerce Committee agenda |
2022-02-10 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | Original reference removed: State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-09 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-02-08 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-08 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported out of Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-02-08 | House | Favorable with CS by Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-02-04 | House | PCS added to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-11-05 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-11-05 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-11-05 | House | Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-11-05 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-10-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H565 (Related) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
S940 (Same As) 2022-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 375
S942 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
S940 (Same As) 2022-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 375
S942 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations