FL S0936 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-10 - Chapter No. 2020-19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-10 - Chapter No. 2020-19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing members receiving care at federal Veterans Health Administration facilities to use certification by a specified number of physicians working at such facilities as proof of total and permanent disability for purposes of establishing eligibility for benefits, etc.
Title
Disability Retirement Benefits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#655 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | Chapter No. 2020-19 | |
2020-06-09 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-05-26 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2020-03-10 | House | Passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-09 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-06 | House | Received |
2020-03-06 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/20 |
2020-03-06 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2020-03-03 | House | In Messages |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/19/20 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-07 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/12/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Favorable by Military and Veterans Affairs and Space; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-31 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs and Space, 02/05/20, 9:30 am, 37 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Now in Military and Veterans Affairs and Space |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/13/20, 1:00 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Military and Veterans Affairs and Space; Rules |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H593 (Same As) 2020-03-09 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) SB 936 passed