FL S0890 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Chapter No. 2017-75
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Chapter No. 2017-75
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring a contract between an agency and a citizen support organization or direct-support organization to include a provision for the orderly cessation of operations and reversion of state funds within a specified timeframe; requiring that certain proceeds be deposited into the Grants and Donations Trust Fund of the Division of Vocational Rehabilitation, instead of the Florida Endowment Foundation for Vocational Rehabilitation; requiring a specified percentage of certain revenues to be deposited into the Florida Association of Centers for Independent Living special reserve account to administer specified programs; extending the date for future review and repeal of provisions relating to the Florida Endowment for Vocational Rehabilitation Act; requiring the foundation to transfer funds to specified entities for certain purposes, etc.
Title
Direct-Support Organizations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#37 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#417 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#12 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#417 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#12 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | Chapter No. 2017-75 | |
2017-06-09 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-06-05 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2017-05-04 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 34 NAYS 1 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (912975) 821 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | In returning messages |
2017-05-03 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 118 NAYS 0 1088 |
2017-05-03 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (049943, 357225) |
2017-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-02 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-05-02 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (646599) 1068 |
2017-05-02 | House | Substituted for CS/CS/HB 907 |
2017-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-01 | House | Received |
2017-05-01 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/17 |
2017-05-01 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2017-04-27 | House | In Messages |
2017-04-27 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-25 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/17 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-04-20 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/20/17, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2017-04-14 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education, 04/13/17, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education |
2017-03-23 | Senate | CS by Education read 1st time |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-03-21 | Senate | CS by Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 03/21/17, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education; Appropriations |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H6035 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee
S1458 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 6037 (Ch. 2017-162)
H907 (Same As) 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 890 (Ch. 2017-75)
S2516 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Conference Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116), CS/CS/SB 890 (Ch. 2017-75), SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70)
S1458 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 6037 (Ch. 2017-162)
H907 (Same As) 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 890 (Ch. 2017-75)
S2516 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Conference Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116), CS/CS/SB 890 (Ch. 2017-75), SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 058 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 08068 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 0848 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
413 | 402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
413 | 4021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
413 | 615 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |