FL H0907 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 890 (Ch. 2017-75)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 890 (Ch. 2017-75)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires contract between agency & certain organizations to include provision for cessation of operations, certain proceeds to be deposited into Grants & Donations Trust Fund of Division of Vocational Rehabilitation, instead of Florida Endowment Foundation for Vocational Rehabilitation, & Florida Association of Centers for Independent Living to administer James Patrick Memorial Work Incentive Personal Attendant Services & Employment Assistance Program; extends date for future review & repeal of Florida Endowment for Vocational Rehabilitation Act; requires Florida Endowment Foundation for Vocational Rehabilitation to transfer funds to specified entities.
Title
Direct-Support Organizations
Sponsors
House Education Committee | House Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee | Rep. Sam Killebrew [R] | Rep. Katie Edwards [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 890 (Ch. 2017-75) |
2017-05-02 | House | Substituted CS/CS/SB 890 |
2017-05-01 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/17 |
2017-04-27 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2017-04-24 | House | CS/CS by Education Committee read 1st time |
2017-04-24 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/17 |
2017-04-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-04-24 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-04-24 | House | CS/CS by- Education Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-21 | House | On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 04/24/17, 2:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2017-04-17 | House | Now in Education Committee |
2017-04-17 | House | Favorable by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/17/17, 4:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2017-03-30 | House | Now in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2017-03-29 | House | CS by Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-29 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-03-28 | House | CS by Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-24 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee, 03/28/17, 3:30 pm, Mashburn Hall |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-01 | House | Referred to Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee; Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2017-02-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S890 (Same As) 2017-06-12 - Chapter No. 2017-75
S2516 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Conference Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116), CS/CS/SB 890 (Ch. 2017-75), SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70)
S2516 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Conference Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116), CS/CS/SB 890 (Ch. 2017-75), SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 058 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 08068 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 0848 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
413 | 402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
413 | 4021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
413 | 615 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |