FL S0854 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2502 (Ch. 2017-71)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2502 (Ch. 2017-71)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creating a task force on affordable housing; requiring members of the task force to serve without compensation; directing the task force to develop recommendations for the state's affordable housing needs, subject to certain requirements, etc.
Title
Task Force on Affordable Housing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2502 (Ch. 2017-71) |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2017-03-15 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/14/17, 10:30 am, 301 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Appropriations; Rules |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1013 (Same As) 2017-05-08 - See SB 2500, Appropriation 2225 / See SB 2502, Section 46
S2502 (Similar To) 2017-06-05 - Chapter No. 2017-71, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 865 (Ch. 2017-42), SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70)
S2502 (Similar To) 2017-06-05 - Chapter No. 2017-71, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 865 (Ch. 2017-42), SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70)