FL S0842 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Defining the terms "hospital" and "physician"; specifying that certain restrictive covenants in employment agreements between physicians and hospitals do not support a legitimate business interest, etc.
Title
Invalid Restrictive Covenants in Health Care
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2022-01-27 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-01-26 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 7 NAYS 3 |
2022-01-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/26/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/19/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Now in Health Policy |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/10/22, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2021-11-16 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Health Policy; Rules |
2021-11-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1449 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee