FL S0828 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Chapter No. 2016-170
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Chapter No. 2016-170
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Office of Insurance Regulation to levy assessments for certain purposes; revising and providing requirements for the levy of assessments; requiring insurers and self-insurance funds to report certain premiums; requiring insurers to collect policy surcharges and pay assessments to the association; revising requirements for reporting premium for assessment calculations; revising and providing requirements and limitations for remittance of assessments to the association, etc.
Title
Insurance Guaranty Association Assessments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#792 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | Chapter No. 2016-170 | |
2016-04-01 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-03-18 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2016-03-08 | House | CS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 |
2016-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-07 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-07 | House | Substituted for CS/CS/CS/HB 467 |
2016-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-04 | House | Received |
2016-03-04 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/16 |
2016-03-04 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2016-02-24 | House | In Messages |
2016-02-23 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/18/16 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/04/16, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2016-01-27 | Senate | CS/CS by Finance and Tax read 1st time |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-01-25 | Senate | CS/CS by Finance and Tax; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 01/25/16, 1:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-13 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Now in Finance and Tax |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-11 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/11/16, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2015-11-19 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Finance and Tax; Fiscal Policy |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0467 (Same As) 2016-03-07 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2016-170)