FL H0467 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Introduced on October 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-07 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2016-170)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-07 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2016-170)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires OIR to levy assessments for certain purposes; revises & providing requirements for levy of assessments; requires insurers & self-insurance funds to report certain premiums; requires insurers to collect policy surcharges & pay assessments to association; revises requirements for reporting premium for assessment calculations; revises & providing requirements & limitations for remittance of assessments to association.
Title
Insurance Guaranty Association Assessments
Sponsors
House Regulatory Affairs Committee | House Finance and Tax Committee | House Insurance and Banking Subcommittee | Sen. Douglas Broxson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2016-170) |
2016-03-07 | House | Substituted CS/CS/SB 828 |
2016-03-04 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/16 |
2016-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-08 | House | CS/CS/CS by Regulatory Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2016-02-08 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-02-04 | House | CS/CS/CS by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-02 | House | On Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 02/04/16, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2016-01-19 | House | Now in Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2016-01-19 | House | CS/CS by Finance and Tax Committee read 1st time |
2016-01-15 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-01-14 | House | CS/CS by Finance and Tax Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-12 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time |
2016-01-12 | House | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax Committee, 01/14/16, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2015-11-24 | House | Now in Finance and Tax Committee |
2015-11-20 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-11-18 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2015-11-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 11/18/15, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2015-11-05 | House | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Committee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2015-10-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0828 (Same As) 2016-04-01 - Chapter No. 2016-170