FL S0818 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing public defenders and regional counsel to have access to persons held in a facility licensed under chapter 394 or chapter 397; requiring that respondents with a serious mental illness be afforded essential elements of care and placed in a continuum of care regimen; authorizing the state to establish that a transfer evaluation was performed by providing the court with a copy of the evaluation before the close of the state's case in chief; revising the requirements for when a person may be taken to a receiving facility for involuntary examination, etc.
Title
Mental Health
Sponsors
Sen. Lauren Book [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/18/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Appropriations |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
212 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 59 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 455 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 459 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 4598 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 4599 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 461 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 4615 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 462 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 463 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 4655 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 467 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 495 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 496 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 9085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 334 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 412 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 416 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 675 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6751 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 681 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6811 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6814 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6815 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6818 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6819 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6821 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6822 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 693 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 695 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6951 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6955 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6957 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 697 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6971 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6975 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6976 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6977 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6978 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 706 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 972 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 2007 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/818 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/818/BillText/Filed/HTML |