FL S0806 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-64
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring that mailed semiannual assessments be received by the Office of Financial Regulation by a specified date; requiring that electronically transmitted semiannual assessments be transmitted to the office by specified dates; revising the individuals for whom certain information must be provided to the office on an application for authority to organize a banking corporation or trust company, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulation of Financial Institutions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#306 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#17 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-22 Chapter No. 2015-64
2015-05-21 Approved by Governor
2015-05-07 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-04-24SenateOrdered enrolled
2015-04-24HouseCS passed; YEAS 112 NAYS 0
2015-04-24HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-23HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-23HouseSubstituted for CS/HB 703
2015-04-22HouseReceived
2015-04-22HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/15
2015-04-22HouseReferred to Calendar
2015-04-22HouseIn Messages
2015-04-22SenateCS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2015-04-22SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-14SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-14SenateRead 2nd time
2015-04-13SenateCS/CS by Rules read 1st time
2015-04-10SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/14/15
2015-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-04-10SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-04-09SenateCS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2015-04-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/09/15, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2015-03-31SenateNow in Rules
2015-03-30SenateFavorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2015-03-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/30/15, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2015-03-19SenateNow in Commerce and Tourism
2015-03-18SenateCS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
2015-03-18SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-03-17SenateCS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2015-03-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/17/15, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2015-03-03SenateIntroduced
2015-02-13SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
2015-02-10SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0703 (Same As) 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 806 (Ch. 2015-64)
S0828 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 806 (Ch. 2015-64)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
655005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
655047Amended CodeSee Bill Text
65560Amended CodeSee Bill Text
655960Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6570275Amended CodeSee Bill Text
65812Amended CodeSee Bill Text
658165Amended CodeSee Bill Text
65819Amended CodeSee Bill Text
66033Amended CodeSee Bill Text
663021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
66308Amended CodeSee Bill Text
663302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
665013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
667003Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback