FL S0828 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 806 (Ch. 2015-64)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing that specified entities of an international banking corporation are not required to produce certain books or records that are maintained outside the United States and are not available to the entities in response to a subpoena; providing that a request for production of certain books or records for a customer of an office of the international banking corporation which is established or maintained in a foreign country must be conducted pursuant to letters rogatory or in accordance with specified treaties or conventions, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

International Banking Corporations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-01SenateDied in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 806 (Ch. 2015-64)
2015-03-03SenateIntroduced
2015-02-20SenateReferred to Judiciary; Banking and Insurance; Rules
2015-02-11SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0806 (Similar To) 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-64

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
663021Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback