FL H0703 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 806 (Ch. 2015-64)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Redefines terms "main office" & "principal office"; revises requirements for certain assessments to be transmitted to OFR by specified dates; deletes requirement that OFR select licensed or certified appraiser to conduct certain appraisals; deletes requirement that OFR approve cost of certain appraisals before payment of that cost by state financial institution, subsidiary, or service corporation; revises individuals for whom certain information must be provided to OFR on application for authority to organize banking corporation or trust company; requires international banking corporation to provide annual certification of capital accounts to OFR by specified date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulation of Financial Institutions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-23HouseLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 806 (Ch. 2015-64)
2015-04-23HouseSubstituted CS/CS/SB 806
2015-04-21HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/15
2015-04-01HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-04-01HouseFavorable by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2015-03-30HouseOn Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 04/01/15, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2015-03-10HouseNow in Regulatory Affairs Committee
2015-03-10HouseFavorable by Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2015-03-06HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/10/15, 12:30 pm, Morris Hall
2015-03-05HouseNow in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee
2015-03-04HouseCS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time
2015-03-04HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-03-03HouseCS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-02-27HouseOn Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 03/03/15, 4:30 pm, Sumner Hall
2015-02-18HouseReferred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee
2015-02-11HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0806 (Same As) 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-64

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
655005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
655047Amended CodeSee Bill Text
65560Amended CodeSee Bill Text
655960Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6570275Amended CodeSee Bill Text
65812Amended CodeSee Bill Text
658165Amended CodeSee Bill Text
65819Amended CodeSee Bill Text
66033Amended CodeSee Bill Text
66308Amended CodeSee Bill Text
663302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
665013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
667003Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback