FL S0752 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Chapter No. 2022-166
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Chapter No. 2022-166
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the Department of Corrections to supervise certain misdemeanor offenders; deleting a prohibition on private entities providing probationary or supervision services to certain misdemeanor offenders; requiring the department to reduce a probationer's or offender's supervision term by a specified amount of time for completing an educational advancement activity; authorizing a private or public entity to provide probation services and other specified programming to misdemeanor offenders, etc.
Title
Probationary or Supervision Services for Misdemeanor Offenders
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Criminal Justice Committee | Sen. George Gainer [R] | Sen. Jason Pizzo [D] |
Sen. Keith Perry [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#849 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Chapter No. 2022-166 | |
2022-06-03 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-05-26 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2022-03-09 | House | CS passed; YEAS 118, NAYS 0 |
2022-03-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-08 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-03-08 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Engrossed 1) |
2022-03-07 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/8/2022) |
2022-03-07 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-03-03 | House | In Messages |
2022-03-03 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (945226) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/22 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/16/22, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2022-01-26 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/25/22, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/11/22, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2021-11-16 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H387 (Similar To) 2022-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 752
H1037 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
S1378 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
H1037 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
S1378 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
948 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |