FL H1037 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires DOC to reduce probationer's supervision term by specified amount for completing an educational advancement activity & for completing specified period of workforce achievement.
Title
Education and Employment Incentives for Probationers
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | House Criminal Justice and Public Safety Subcommittee | Rep. Traci Koster [R] | Rep. Mike Caruso [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-21 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Justice Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Justice Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died on Second Reading Calendar |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-24 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-02-24 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-02-22 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2022-02-22 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-22 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-22 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-21 | House | Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | PCS added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2022-02-08 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported out of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-08 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-04 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-02-04 | House | Added to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2022-02-04 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-04 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-04 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-03 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-03 | House | Reported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-02-01 | House | PCS added to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-07 | House | Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-01-07 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-07 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-07 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-12-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1378 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
S752 (Similar To) 2022-06-06 - Chapter No. 2022-166
S752 (Similar To) 2022-06-06 - Chapter No. 2022-166