FL S0714 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 301 (Ch. 2019-108)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Citing this act as "Omnibus Prime"; increasing the required reimbursement of loss adjustment expenses in reimbursement contracts between the State Board of Administration and property insurers under the Florida Hurricane Catastrophe Fund; specifying means by which an insurance company may forward certificates of title of certain salvage motor vehicles or mobile homes to the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles; revising a criminal penalty for the submission, with certain intent, of an employer application for workers' compensation insurance coverage which contains false, misleading, or incomplete information; revising the definition of the term "diligent effort" as used in the Surplus Lines Law, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02SenateLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 301 (Ch. 2019-108)
2019-05-02SenateSubstituted CS/CS/CS/HB 301
2019-05-02SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-30SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/19
2019-04-22SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-22SenateCS/CS/CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2019-04-22SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-18SenateCS/CS/CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 1
2019-04-16SenateCS/CS/CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
2019-04-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2019-04-11SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-11SenateRemaining references corrected to Appropriations
2019-04-11SenateOriginal reference(s) removed: Rules
2019-04-10SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-08SenateCS/CS/CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2019-04-03SenateCS/CS by Judiciary read 1st time
2019-04-03SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 04/08/19, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-04-03SenateNow in Banking and Insurance
2019-04-03SenateRemaining references corrected to Banking and Insurance; Rules
2019-04-03SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-01SenateCS/CS by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2019-03-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/01/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-14SenateCS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
2019-03-13SenateNow in Judiciary
2019-03-13SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-11SenateCS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-03-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/11/19, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules
2019-02-05SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H301 (Similar To) 2019-06-18 - Chapter No. 2019-108
H387 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Banking and Insurance, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 301 (Ch. 2019-108)
H765 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 301 (Ch. 2019-108)
S538 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 301 (Ch. 2019-108)
S1232 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 301 (Ch. 2019-108), CS/HB 1057 (Ch. 2019-92)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
215555Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21555953Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31930Amended CodeSee Bill Text
440381Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6241055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
624155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
624404Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6244085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
626914Amended CodeSee Bill Text
626916Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6269541Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627062Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6270655Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6271711Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6274102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627426Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6274555Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277295Amended CodeSee Bill Text
768094Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/714
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/714/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/714/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/714/BillText/c2/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/714/BillText/c3/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/714/BillText/c4/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/714/Amendment/917258/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/714/Amendment/738068/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/714/Amendment/437860/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/714/Amendment/545368/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/714/Amendment/474272/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/714/Amendment/548022/HTML

Bill Comments 750

feedback