FL S0538 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Deleting a limitation on per-policy fees charged by surplus lines agents for exporting certified policies; requiring that such fees be itemized separately for the customer before purchase and enumerated in the policy; deleting a requirement for surplus lines agents to quarterly file a certain affidavit with the Florida Surplus Lines Service Office, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nonadmitted Insurance Market Reform

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-10SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-09SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-04-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 04/09/19, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-14SenateCS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
2019-03-13SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
2019-03-13SenateRemaining references corrected to Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
2019-03-13SenateOriginal reference(s) removed: Finance and Tax
2019-03-12SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-11SenateCS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-03-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/11/19, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-08SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2019-01-25SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H387 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Banking and Insurance
H301 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Ordered enrolled
S714 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 301

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
626916Amended CodeSee Bill Text
626931Amended CodeSee Bill Text
626932Amended CodeSee Bill Text
626935Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627715Amended CodeSee Bill Text
629401Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback