FL S0646 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Specifying the rights of children and young adults in out-of-home care; requiring the Florida Children's Ombudsman to serve as an autonomous entity within the department for certain purposes; requiring that a case plan be developed in a face-to-face conference with a caregiver of a child under certain circumstances; requiring a caseworker to provide information about subsidies provided by early learning coalitions to caregivers of certain children; providing additional requirements for the licensure and operation of family foster homes, residential child-caring agencies, and child-placing agencies, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Welfare

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 04/04/19, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2019-03-07SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
2019-03-07SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2019-03-05SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-04SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2019-02-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/04/19, 3:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-01-31SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H823 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
394085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394088Amended CodeSee Bill Text
396011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
396013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39604Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39701Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409175Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4091753Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409988Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback