FL H0823 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revises & creates provisions related to Florida Children's Ombudsman, case plan development, & social study reports for judicial review; provides additional requirements for caseworkers & caregivers of dependent children; requires lead agencies to recruit & retain foster homes; provides responsibilities for lead agencies in recruitment & retention of foster homes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Welfare

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Health and Human Services Committee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-28HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-28HouseCS referred to Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-28HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-27HouseCS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-27HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-25HouseCS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2019-03-21HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 03/25/19, 4:00 pm, 12 HOB
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-20HouseReferred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-02-13HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S646 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
394085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394088Amended CodeSee Bill Text
396011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
396013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39604Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39701Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409175Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4091753Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409988Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback