FL S0632 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Directing the Department of Health to expand statewide screening of newborns to include screening for adrenoleukodystrophy when adopted for inclusion on the federal Recommended Uniform Screening Panel, etc.
Title
Newborn Adrenoleukodystrophy Screening
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 04/07/15, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-31 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Now in Banking and Insurance |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-03-23 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/23/15, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Banking and Insurance; Appropriations |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0403 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
383 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
383 | 147 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |