FL S0592 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 375
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Expanding the exceptions to a requirement that a prescriber or dispenser must consult the program to review a patient's controlled substance dispensing history before prescribing or dispensing a controlled substance for a patient of a certain age, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prescription Drug Monitoring Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 375
2019-05-02SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 375
2019-05-02SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/19
2019-04-03SenateRetained on Calendar
2019-04-02SenateCS by Appropriations read 1st time
2019-04-01SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/03/19
2019-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-03-28SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-27SenateCS by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2019-03-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/28/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Meeting cancelled
2019-03-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/27/19, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-07SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-03-06SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 03/06/19, 4:15 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-02-19SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2019-02-19SenateFavorable by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-02-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/19/19, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2019-02-08SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-01-29SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H375 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Ordered enrolled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
893055Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback