FL H0375 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-70
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes DOH to enter into reciprocal agreements to share prescription drug monitoring information with specified federal agencies; exempts from requirement to check patient's dispensing history the prescribing of or dispensing controlled substance to patients admitted to hospice for alleviation of pain related to terminal condition or to patients receiving palliative care for terminal illnesses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prescription Drug Monitoring Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#196 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Chapter No. 2019-70
2019-06-07 Approved by Governor
2019-06-05 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-05-03HouseOrdered enrolled
2019-05-03SenateCS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2019-05-03SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-05-02SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-02SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 592
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-05-02SenateWithdrawn from Health Policy; Appropriations
2019-04-25SenateReceived
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations
2019-04-24SenateIn Messages
2019-04-24HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
2019-04-24HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-23HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-23HouseAmendment(s) adopted (573591)
2019-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-18HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/19
2019-03-25HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-25HouseCS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
2019-03-22HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-21HouseCS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2019-03-19HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 03/21/19, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-15HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-15HouseCS referred to Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-15HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-14HouseCS by Health Quality Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-14HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-12HouseCS by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2019-03-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 03/12/19, 8:30 am, Webster Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-01-21HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S592 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 375
H1253 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
893055Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback