FL S0588 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - CS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting certain governmental entities from adopting or enforcing local ordinances or regulations relating to over-the-counter proprietary drugs and cosmetics before a specified date; preempting the establishment of the requirements for alternate generated power sources to the state and to the Division of Emergency Management, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Preemption of Local Regulations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateCS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
2019-04-11SenateNow in Rules
2019-04-10SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-09SenateCS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-04-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/09/19, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Building
2019-04-02SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/02/19, 2:00 pm, 301 Senate Building --Not Considered
2019-03-07SenateCS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
2019-03-07SenateNow in Community Affairs
2019-03-05SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-04SenateCS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 3 NAYS 1
2019-02-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/04/19, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-02-08SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Community Affairs; Rules
2019-01-29SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S502 (Similar To) 2019-03-05 - Introduced
H603 (Same As) 2019-03-29 - Now in Appropriations Committee
H1299 (Similar To) 2019-04-16 - On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 04/18/19, 8:15 am, Webster Hall

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4037034Amended CodeSee Bill Text
499002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
499072Amended CodeSee Bill Text
526143Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback