FL S0502 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting a store or food service business from providing a carryout bag made of plastic film to a customer; prohibiting a food service business from selling or providing a single-use plastic straw to a customer, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibition of Plastic Carryout Bags and Straws

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Commerce and Tourism
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-08SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Community Affairs; Rules
2019-01-24SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S588 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules
H603 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Committee
H1299 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Commerce and Tourism, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7103 (Ch. 2019-165)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
509235Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback