FL S0570 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Reducing the distance applicable to certain controlled substance offenses committed within certain drug-free zones; providing that only offenses involving the sale or manufacturing of a controlled substance are subject to enhanced penalties when committed within a drug-free zone, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sentencing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Judiciary
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-26SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2018-02-23SenateNow in Judiciary
2018-02-22SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-20SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 2
2018-02-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/20/18, 11:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-11-02SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2017-10-19SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H355 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S866 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
775082Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89313Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210024Amended CodeSee Bill Text
92100241Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210026Amended CodeSee Bill Text
92100265Amended CodeSee Bill Text
92406Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94806Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94820Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback