FL H0355 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 17 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-09 - Introduced
Pending: House Criminal Justice Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revises computation of lowest permissible sentence under Criminal Punishment Code.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Sentencing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-10-26HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2017-10-17HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S570 (Same As) 2018-02-23 - Now in Judiciary
S866 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
775082Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210024Amended CodeSee Bill Text
92100241Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210026Amended CodeSee Bill Text
92100265Amended CodeSee Bill Text
92406Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94806Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94820Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback