FL S0866 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the threshold of assessed sentence points below which a court must sentence nonviolent felony offenders who commit certain offenses on or after a specified date to a nonstate prison sanction, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sentencing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-25SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2018-01-25SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 8 NAYS 2
2018-01-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/25/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-10SenateNow in Judiciary
2018-01-09SenateFavorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 2
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2018-01-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/09/18, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2017-11-29SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2017-11-14SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H355 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S570 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
775082Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210024Amended CodeSee Bill Text
92100241Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210026Amended CodeSee Bill Text
92100265Amended CodeSee Bill Text
92406Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94806Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94820Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback