FL S0568 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Environmental Preservation and Conservation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Environmental Preservation and Conservation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a short title. Provides legislative findings and intent with respect to the need to protect and restore springs and ground water.
Title
Florida Springs Protection Act [EPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Environmental Preservation and Conservation | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Community Affairs; Health Regulation; General Government Appropriations -SJ 00044 | |
2009-12-09 | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Community Affairs; Health Regulation; General Government Appropriations | |
2009-10-27 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0550 (Similar To) 2010-06-07 - Chapter No. 2010-205; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1271 (Ch. 2010-225)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0369 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0369 | 402 | New Code | See Bill Text |