FL S0566 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 20 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-27 - Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising licensure requirements for clinical social workers, marriage and family therapists, and mental health counselors, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental Health Professional Licensure

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Senate - Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-27SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2022-01-27SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2022-01-24SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/27/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2022-01-11SenateCS by Health Policy read 1st time
2022-01-11SenateNow in Rules
2022-01-11SenateFavorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2022-01-11SenateIntroduced
2022-01-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/11/22, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2021-12-06SenateNow in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
2021-12-02SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-12-02SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2021-11-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 12/02/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-11-03SenateReferred to Health Policy; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules
2021-10-20SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H343 (Same As) 2022-01-14 - Now in Health & Human Services Committee
S768 (Similar To) 2022-01-27 - Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
H693 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
491005Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/566
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/566/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/566/BillText/c1/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/566/Amendment/604342/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/566/Analyses/2022s00566.pre.hp.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/566/Analyses/2022s00566.hp.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/566/Analyses/2022s00566.pre.cf.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/566/Analyses/2022s00566.cf.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/566/Analyses/2022s00566.pre.rc.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/566/Analyses/2022s00566.rc.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/566/Vote/2021-12-02%200900AM~S00566%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/566/Vote/2022-01-11%200130PM~S00566%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/566/Vote/2022-01-27%200900AM~S00566%20Vote%20Record.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback